WY SF0101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; authorizing the use of pen registers and trap and trace devices for the apprehension of persons suspected of felony and other offenses as specified; making conforming amendments; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pen registers and trap and trace devices-authorization.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Sen. Lynn Hutchings [R] |
Sen. John Kolb [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-19 | Bill Number Assigned |