WY SF0162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state funded capital construction; providing definitions; providing appropriations and increasing prior appropriations for purposes related to state funded capital construction; modifying prior appropriations; making certain appropriations subject to specified terms and conditions; providing matching funds for specified projects; authorizing legislative meeting facilities; providing an appropriation for an advisory task force related to state facilities; requiring studies and reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State funded capital construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - Adopted SF0162JC001: 43-9-8-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Adopted SF0162JC001: 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 13-15-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-19-2-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-16-2-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Adopted SF0162JC001: 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 13-15-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-19-2-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-16-2-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 205 | |
2019-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0083 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0083 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0083 |
2019-02-28 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0083 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-27 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 |
2019-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Rescind original vote pursuant to SR 12-11 22-7-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |