AK HB214 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the Workers' Compensation Appeals Commission; relating to decisions and orders of the Alaska Workers' Compensation Board; relating to superior court jurisdiction over appeals from Alaska Workers' Compensation Board decisions and orders; repealing Rules 201.1, 401.1, and 501.1, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure, and amending Rules 202(a), 204(a) - (c), 210(e), 508(g), 601(b), 602, and 603, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Workers' Comp Appeals Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-10 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-10 | House | FN4: (LWF) |
2016-04-10 | House | FN2: ZERO(AJS) |
2016-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-04-10 | House | NR: LYNN, FOSTER |
2016-04-10 | House | DP: MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN, KELLER, LEDOUX |
2016-04-10 | House | JUD RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR |
2016-04-01 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2016-03-31 | House | FN3: (LWF) |
2016-03-31 | House | FN2: ZERO(AJS) |
2016-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-03-31 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, HUGHES, LEDOUX, TILTON |
2016-03-31 | House | DP: COLVER, KITO, OLSON |
2016-03-31 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 4NR |
2016-01-19 | House | L&C, JUD |
2016-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |