AK HB226 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act renaming Seldon Road and that portion of Bogard Road that extends between Palmer and Meadow Lakes as Veterans' Way.
Title
Naming Veterans' Way In Mat-su
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Dahlstrom [R] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Carl Gatto [R] | Rep. John Harris [R] |
Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Mark Neuman [R] | Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] | Rep. William Thomas [R] |
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 89 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:06 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: CSHB 226(TRA) | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, DYSON, HUGGINS | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 226(TRA) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-18 | FN2: (DOT) | |
2010-04-18 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT 5DP 2NR | |
2010-04-10 | TRA REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-04-08 | TRA, FIN | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-07 | VERSION: CSHB 226(TRA) | |
2010-04-07 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-07 | COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, TUCK, DAHLSTROM | |
2010-04-07 | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 226(TRA) | |
2010-04-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-07 | TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-07 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-07 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, GARA | |
2010-04-01 | FN2: (DOT) | |
2010-04-01 | FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE | |
2010-04-01 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, N.FOSTER, SALMON, | |
2010-04-01 | FIN RPT CS(TRA) 10DP | |
2010-03-19 | FN1: (DOT) | |
2010-03-19 | DP: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, P.WILSON | |
2010-03-19 | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 6DP | |
2009-04-10 | TRA, FIN | |
2009-04-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |