AK HB226 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN3: (GOV/ALL DEPTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN3: (GOV/ALL DEPTS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the compensation of certain employees of the executive branch, judicial branch, and University of Alaska; relating to the compensation of certain employees of the legislative branch; and increasing the salaries of certain attorneys and administrative law judges employed by the state.
Title
Pay Increases For Certain State Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Sen. Matt Claman [D] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] |
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | FN3: (GOV/ALL DEPTS) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/30/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/1 CHAPTER 50 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | House | 1:40 P.M. 7/8/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y23 N15 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 226(FIN) AM(EFD FLD) AM S |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N2 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 226(FIN) AM(EFD FLD) AM S |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN3: (GOV/ALL DEPTS) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-17 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WILSON |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 2NR 5DP |
2022-05-16 | Senate | FIN |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 226(FIN) AM(EFD FLD) |
2022-05-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-16 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y26 N14 |
2022-05-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N17 |
2022-05-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-15 | House | MCCABE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2022-05-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N6 E1 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | PASSED Y21 N14 E1 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 226(FIN) AM |
2022-05-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR |
2022-05-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 5/12 - ON 5/13 CALENDAR |
2022-05-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, SCHRAGE |
2022-05-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR |
2022-05-11 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N26 |
2022-05-11 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N22 |
2022-05-11 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y35 N4 A1 |
2022-05-11 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y25 N15 |
2022-05-11 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2022 |
2022-05-09 | House | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: LEBON, JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2022-05-09 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR |
2022-04-20 | House | FN1: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2022-04-20 | House | AM: KAUFMAN, EASTMAN, VANCE |
2022-04-20 | House | DP: TARR, CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-04-20 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 4DP 3AM |
2022-04-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2022-01-18 | House | STA, FIN |
2022-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22 |
Subjects
Attorneys
Employment
Executive Branch
Judges
Labor Relations
Labor Unions
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Wages
Employment
Executive Branch
Judges
Labor Relations
Labor Unions
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Wages