AK HB262 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting the Public Defender Agency and the office of public advocacy from certain provisions of the State Procurement Code; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Procurement Exemption: Pda, Opa
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] | Rep. Kurt Olson [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Rep. Steve Thompson [R] |
Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: HB 262 Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 79 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: HB 262 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 262 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-21 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-21 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2014-03-05 | Senate | STA |
2014-03-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-03 | House | VERSION: HB 262 |
2014-03-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2014-03-03 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 262 |
2014-03-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2014-02-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GRUENBERG |
2014-02-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-21 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-21 | House | STA RPT 5DP |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2014-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON |
2014-01-21 | House | STA |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14 |