AK HB51 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3-1-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN1: (DOT) FROM SB 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - FN1: (DOT) FROM SB 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to refrigerants designated as acceptable for use under federal law; relating to firefighting substances; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Desig. Refrigerant Use; Pfas Use/disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | FN1: (DOT) FROM SB 67 |
2023-10-16 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39 |
2023-10-16 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | VETOED BY GOVERNOR 8/26/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | 10:45 A.M. 8/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN |
2023-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-17 | House | CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N2 |
2023-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7 |
2023-05-17 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2023-05-17 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2023-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2023-05-16 | Senate | OLSON, BISHOP, CLAMAN |
2023-05-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, TOBIN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, |
2023-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2023-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL |
2023-05-15 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N2 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/23 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR |
2023-05-03 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2023-03-06 | Senate | L&C |
2023-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-03-01 | House | VERSION: HB 51 |
2023-03-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-03-01 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 |
2023-03-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51 |
2023-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON |
2023-02-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR |
2023-02-27 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2023-02-27 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N22 E2 |
2023-02-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-02-24 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 2/24 - ON 2/27 CALENDAR |
2023-02-22 | House | HELD TO 2/24 CALENDAR |
2023-02-20 | House | HELD TO 2/22 CALENDAR |
2023-02-20 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2023 |
2023-02-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-02-13 | House | DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SADDLER, PRAX, CARRICK, RUFFRIDGE |
2023-02-13 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2023-02-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE |
2023-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MEARS |
2023-01-30 | House | L&C |
2023-01-30 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Buildings
Environmental Concerns
Fire Protection
Hazardous Substances
Oil & Gas
Public Safety
Regulations
Safety
Environmental Concerns
Fire Protection
Hazardous Substances
Oil & Gas
Public Safety
Regulations
Safety