AK HB56 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/7/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/7/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the certification of veterinarians; exempting veterinarians from the requirements of the controlled substance prescription database; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veterinarians; Controlled Substance Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-13 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/7/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 14 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | House | 2:26 P.M. 6/26/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2023-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y40 |
2023-05-13 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 2 |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2023-05-13 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2023-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 56(L&C) |
2023-05-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2023-05-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 56(L&C) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL |
2023-05-11 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, MERRICK, GRAY-JACKSON, BISHOP, DUNBAR |
2023-04-19 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 2 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 5DP NEW TITLE |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK, HUGHES |
2023-03-31 | Senate | BJORKMAN, BISHOP, CLAMAN |
2023-03-31 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MYERS, TOBIN, KAUFMAN, WILSON, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, |
2023-03-31 | Senate | L&C |
2023-03-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-03-29 | House | VERSION: HB 56 |
2023-03-29 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT, C.JOHNSON, CRONK, TILTON, RAUSCHER |
2023-03-29 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E4 |
2023-03-29 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 56 |
2023-03-29 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2023-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-03-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-03-27 | House | DP: PRAX, CARRICK, SADDLER, RUFFRIDGE |
2023-03-27 | House | L&C RPT 4DP |
2023-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2023-03-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-03-15 | House | DP: SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, SADDLER, MINA, PRAX |
2023-03-15 | House | HSS RPT 6DP |
2023-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, STAPP, TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, STORY, WRIGHT |
2023-03-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, HIMSCHOOT, STUTES |
2023-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY, CARPENTER, MINA, ALLARD |
2023-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2023-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2023-02-03 | House | HSS, L&C |
2023-02-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Animals
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists