AK HB78 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing September 10 as Alaska Community Health Aide Appreciation Day.
Title
Ak Community Health Aide Appreciation Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 17 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | House | 8:30 A.M. 7/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: HB 78 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2023-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEVENS |
2023-04-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CAL |
2023-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/23 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, OLSON, HUGHES |
2023-04-03 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, BISHOP |
2023-04-03 | Senate | CRA REFERRAL WAIVED |
2023-04-03 | Senate | CRA |
2023-04-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-03-31 | House | VERSION: HB 78 |
2023-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STAPP, STUTES, WRIGHT |
2023-03-31 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2023-03-31 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2023-03-29 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/31 CALENDAR |
2023-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-03-27 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/29 CALENDAR |
2023-03-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2023-03-24 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/24 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR |
2023-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, CRONK, STORY, C.JOHNSON, GALVIN, MINA, MEARS |
2023-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR |
2023-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH, DIBERT, FIELDS, CARRICK, HIMSCHOOT, ARMSTRONG |
2023-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2023-03-17 | House | DP: MCCABE, RUFFRIDGE, HIMSCHOOT, PATKOTAK, MCKAY, MEARS, MCCORMICK |
2023-03-17 | House | CRA RPT 7DP |
2023-02-20 | House | CRA |
2023-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |