AK HCR28 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 220, relating to energy efficiency, energy conservation, and alternative energy, to an emerging energy technology fund, to the lease of state land to a public electric utility, to the Alaska heating assistance program, to state energy use data, to the Southeast energy fund, to nuclear energy production and facilities, to the definition of 'power project' or 'project' as it relates to rural and statewide energy programs and the Alaska Energy Authority, and to the definition of 'alternative energy system'; establishing an Alaska energy efficiency revolving loan fund; directing the Department of Transportation and Public Facilities to prepare a report on the feasibility of using compressed natural gas to power vehicles in the state, including vehicles owned or operated by the state, and including in that study, if warranted, a pilot program proposal for powering some vehicles owned or operated by the state with compressed natural gas; authorizing and relating to the issuance of bonds by the Alaska Housing Finance Corporation; and relating to a report regarding a municipal energy improvements financing program and to an energy report by the Office of the Governor.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 220
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 58 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCR 28 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCR 28 | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y37 A3 | |
2010-04-17 | HELD TO 4/18 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | RLS FOR CALENDARING | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Cooperatives
Education
Energy
Funds
Grants
Housing
Limited Entry
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Planning
Procurements
Public Finance
Public Works
Taxation
Uniform Rules
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Utilities
Education
Energy
Funds
Grants
Housing
Limited Entry
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Planning
Procurements
Public Finance
Public Works
Taxation
Uniform Rules
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Utilities