AK HJR19 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Port Mackenzie & Northern Rail Extensions
Title
Port Mackenzie & Northern Rail Extensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 as amended (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 as amended (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2024-05-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-01 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | NR: MYERS, TOBIN, KIEHL |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DP: KAUFMAN, WILSON |
2024-04-17 | Senate | TRA RPT 2DP 3NR |
2024-03-07 | Senate | TRA |
2024-03-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-06 | House | VERSION: HJR 19 AM |
2024-03-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-03-06 | House | PASSED Y32 N8 |
2024-03-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 19 AM |
2024-03-04 | House | HELD TO 3/6 CALENDAR |
2024-03-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 5 AS AMD FAILED Y17 N22 E1 |
2024-03-01 | House | AM 1 TO AM 5 ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 5 OFFERED |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1 |
2024-03-01 | House | AM 1 TO AM 2 FAILED Y19 N20 E1 |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED |
2024-03-01 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N30 E1 |
2024-03-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | MLV REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA) |
2024-02-28 | House | NR: MINA |
2024-02-28 | House | DP: STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE |
2024-02-28 | House | TRA RPT 6DP 1NR |
2024-02-14 | House | TRA, MLV |
2024-02-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Economic Development
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Minerals
Mining
Railroad
Transportation
Warfare
Economic Development
Economy
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Minerals
Mining
Railroad
Transportation
Warfare