AK SB106 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to renewal of insurance coverage for homeowners and renters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Homeowner/renter Insurance Renewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2020-05-18 | Senate | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 4/30 CH 27 SLA 20 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | 10:15 AM 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-26 | House | VERSION: CSSB 106(L&C) |
2020-03-26 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2020-03-26 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2020-03-25 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2020-03-25 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2020-03-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2020-03-25 | House | PASSED Y35 N2 E3 |
2020-03-25 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(L&C) |
2020-03-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR |
2020-03-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2020-02-21 | House | DP: GILLIS, HANNAN, STORY, FIELDS, RASMUSSEN, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-02-21 | House | L&C RPT 7DP |
2020-02-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2019-05-15 | House | L&C |
2019-05-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 106(L&C) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-05-14 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REINBOLD, KIEHL |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(L&C) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-14 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019 |
2019-05-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-05-11 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON |
2019-05-11 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SHOWER, OLSON |
2019-05-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BISHOP, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, GRAY-JACKSON, WILSON, |
2019-04-10 | Senate | L&C |
2019-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |