AK SB88 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - MOTION TO WAIVE CRA REFERRAL FAILED Y4 N13 E2 A1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - MOTION TO WAIVE CRA REFERRAL FAILED Y4 N13 E2 A1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to new defined benefit tiers in the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Teachers & Pub Employee Retirement Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] | Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] |
Sen. William Wielechowski [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Waive bill from CRA Committee? (Y: 4 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | MOTION TO WAIVE CRA REFERRAL FAILED Y4 N13 E2 A1 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, STEVENS, WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS |
2015-04-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE |
2015-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS |
2015-03-25 | Senate | CRA, FIN |
2015-03-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |