AK SCR9 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health/substance Assistance Parity
Title
Mental Health/substance Assistance Parity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 23 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | 3:25 P.M. 6/19/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-04-29 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MINA, GALVIN, JOSEPHSON, WRIGHT |
2024-04-29 | House | VERSION: SCR 9 |
2024-04-29 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2024-04-29 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E1 A1 |
2024-04-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-29 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2024-04-05 | House | RLS |
2024-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-03 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 9 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | PASSED Y19 E1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, KIEHL, TOBIN |
2024-03-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DP: TOBIN, GIESSEL |
2024-03-27 | Senate | NR: WILSON, KAUFMAN |
2024-03-27 | Senate | HSS RPT 2DP 2NR |
2024-02-19 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-19 | Senate | HSS |
2024-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |