AZ SB1057 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; culpable mental state; requirement
Title
Crimes; culpable mental state; requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |