AZ SB1440 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft; audible sound devices
Title
Watercraft; audible sound devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |