CA AB167 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51225.3 of the Education Code, relating to high school graduation.
Title
High school graduation: local requirements: foster
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 167 ADAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB167 Adams By Huff (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 167 ADAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB167 Adams By Huff (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 167 ADAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3091.) | |
2009-09-03 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2114.) | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-17 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). | |
2009-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1239.) | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-01-29 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | |
2009-01-28 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |