CA AB3119 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 170019 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the San Diego County Regional Airport Authority.
Title
San Diego International Airport Mobility and Sustainability Committee: airport mobility and sustainability plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3119 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3119 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 5550.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 170000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170019 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170032 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170044 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170056 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170058 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170062 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170084 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170085 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 170086 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |