CA AB3259 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1500, 2155, 6321, 6405, 6541, 6567, 6598, 6768, 8083, 9210, 10602, 11222, 12102, and 12104 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3259 E. & R (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3259 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day By BERMAN (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3259 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day By BERMAN (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5258.) |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 12102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 12104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6567 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6598 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6768 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8083 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |