CO HB1370 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to reduce the cost of use of natural gas infrastructure, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Reduce Cost of Use of Natural Gas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1370 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 24-1370 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 14 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 14 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1370, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1370, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1370 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 24-1370 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 14 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 14 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1370, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 24-1370, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |