CO SB212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
12-month Eligibility Child Care Assistance Prog
Title
12-month Eligibility Child Care Assistance Prog
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole, with a favorable recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-212 to the Committee of the Whole, with a favorable recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |