CO SB212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the Colorado board of veterans affairs.
Title
Sunset Board Of Veterans Affairs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |