FL H0353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that employees of governing body of municipality, metropolitan planning organization, or special district that applies to participate in FRS on or after certain date may enroll only in defined contribution program; authorizes enrollment in pension plan for employees of governing bodies that have elected or applied to participate in FRS before certain date; provides for retroactive application.
Title
Local Government Participation in Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0428 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/353 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0353/BillText/Filed/PDF |