FL S0428 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that employees of a governing body of a municipality, metropolitan planning organization, or special district that applies to participate in the Florida Retirement System on or after a certain date may enroll only in the defined contribution program; authorizing enrollment in the pension plan for employees of governing bodies that have elected or applied to participate in the Florida Retirement System before a certain date, etc.
Title
Local Government Participation in the Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/06/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0353 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee