FL H1505 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates additional springs as Outstanding Florida Springs.
Title
Outstanding Florida Springs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1134 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1505 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1505/BillText/Filed/PDF |