FL S1134 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Warm Mineral Springs as an Outstanding Florida Spring, etc.
Title
Outstanding Florida Springs
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1505 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |