FL H7175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces frequency of compliance reports during term of consumptive use permit; prohibits decreases in maximum permitted allocation for consumptive use of water under specified conditions; provides exception to certain revocation of consumptive use permits for implementation of conservation measures.
Title
Consumptive Use Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00763 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00763 | |
2010-04-12 | On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/14/10, 9:15 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-29 | Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00419 | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 8 NAYS 1 -HJ 00419 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00378 | |
2010-03-22 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00353 |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |