FL S0896 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "solar facility"; providing that solar facilities are a permitted use in local government comprehensive plan agricultural land use categories and certain agricultural zoning districts; authorizing the Florida Public Service Commission to approve cost recovery by a gas public utility for certain contracts for the purchase of renewable natural gas, etc.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Jason Brodeur [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#362 (Y: 86 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-178 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-28 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 86, NAYS 29 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 14 |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (633872) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Now in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/09/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H539 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
H761 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1008 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S1960 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
H761 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1008 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S1960 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |