FL S1960 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring solar facilities to be a permitted use by right in all agricultural land use categories in applicable local governmental comprehensive plans and zoning districts within certain areas; requiring solar facilities to comply with certain local requirements; requiring certain lands classified as agricultural to maintain such classification if the land is leased for certain renewable energy purposes; providing that the Florida Electrical Power Plant Siting Act does not apply to a stand-alone or colocated alternative or renewable energy facility that meets certain requirements, etc.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H761 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1008 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S896 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
S1008 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S896 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 32071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1960 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1960/BillText/Filed/HTML |