FL S1008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that solar facilities are a permitted use in local government comprehensive plan agricultural land use categories and certain agricultural zoning districts; requiring solar facilities to comply with specified criteria; authorizing counties to adopt certain ordinances, etc.
Title
Solar Electrical Generating Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H761 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1960 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S896 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
S1960 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2021-178)
S896 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-178
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1008 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1008/BillText/Filed/HTML |