HI HB1416 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to adopt rules, contingent on the approval of the Hawaii state plan amendment by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, to remove the $2,000-per-individual asset limit for eligibility for assistance under the med-QUEST program. Requires a report to legislature. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1416 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1416&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1416_HD1_.HTM |