HI HB177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends procedures for nominating and electing a U.S. senator to complete an unexpired term after a vacancy occurs.
Title
Office of Elections Package; Elections; Vacancies; Nominations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB440 (Same As) 2015-07-02 - Act 179, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=177&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB177_.HTM |