HI HB1912 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the kupuna caregivers program. Requires the Executive Office on Aging to provide additional information regarding the outcomes of the kupuna caregivers program in its annual report on elder programs. (HB1912 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Kupuna Caregivers Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2587 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPH/HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-18 2:55PM in conference room 016.