HI HB1913 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts qualified small businesses from the general excise tax. (HB1913 HD1)
Title
General Excise Tax Exemption; Small Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-05-16 9:01AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |