HI HB2077 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Public Employees Training Program within the Department of Human Resources Development to provide training programs to improve and enhance state employees' understanding of their job duties. Allocates one percent of collective bargaining increases to the Public Employees Training Program. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Employee Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; S. Chang, English. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 656) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Taniguchi, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3546) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 183). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |