HI HB2077 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Kapela, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Kapela, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Converts the positions of the administrator of the Hawaii criminal justice data center and the chief special investigator of the department of the attorney general from civil service status to exempt status. Effective 1/1/2222. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Employees Of The Department Of The Attorney General.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Kapela, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3045 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to JDC/LCA, WAM.