HI HB386 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers jurisdiction over workers' compensation fraud from the department of labor and industrial relations to the insurance fraud investigations unit of the insurance division of the department of commerce and consumer affairs.
Title
Workers' Compensation Fraud
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-28-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=386 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB386_.HTM |