HI HB397 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Assesses a surcharge tax on the sale of consumer fireworks. Requires retailers to report on fireworks sold and requires the Department of Health to report on the effects of fireworks on young children. (HB397 HD1)
Title
Fireworks; Surcharge Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Pine, Takai excused (2). | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Re-referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 15 | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Re-referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 14 | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Rhoads, Takumi, Pine; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Yamashita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 3:30pm in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:15AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS, TCI, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |