HI HB397 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the R.E.A.C.H. (Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health) program in the office of youth services to provide a standardized framework and funding for afterschool programs in public middle schools, including charter schools. Establishes a revolving fund to receive fees and other moneys to fund the costs of administering and operating the program. (HB397 HD2)
Title
Afterschool Programs; Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program; R.E.A.C.H.; Revolving Fund ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Ito. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB980 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).