HI HB649 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows unit owners in planned community associations and condominium associations to withhold legal fees from assessments claimed by associations pending decision in any mediation, arbitration, or court proceeding in which the owner has filed for a determination of the validity of the amounts and attorney's fees claimed by the association. (HB649 HD1)
Title
Relating To Association Legal Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:15PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17. |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-02-17 3:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).