HI HB709 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires after 7/1/11, the use of a glottal stop in the spelling of "Hawaii" in all documents and signs prepared by or for state or county agencies or officials. Authorizes the revisor of statutes to change the spelling of the name of the State to include the glottal stop when preparing supplements and replacement volumes of the Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective 7/1/11.
Title
Hawaiian Language; Spelling; Name of State
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW/CUA on Wednesday, 02-02-11 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HAW/CUA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=709 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB709_.HTM |