HI HB709 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to assist the DLNR in developing rules that regulate activities within and that are applicable to all coastal areas and nearshore waters. Requires reports to the Legislature in 2015, 2016, and 2017. Prohibits DLNR from adopting any such rules affecting coastal areas and nearshore waters of Niihau until the task force submits a final report. Appropriates funds for the DLNR to conduct public outreach meetings to adopt rules applicable to all coastal areas and nearshore waters. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB709 HD2)
Title
Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 119). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ing voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Thielen, Woodson excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4). |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-07-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-04 | House | Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2014-02-04 | House | HD 1 adopted and recommitted to OMH for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Yamane excused. |
2014-02-04 | House | Recommends recommittal to OMH. |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 149-14) as amended in HD 1. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-03-14 8:25AM in conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to OMH, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |