HI HB727 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage annually starting January 1, 2020. Beginning September 30, 2024, and thereafter, requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers, subject to certain conditions. Repeals the tip credit.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB727 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB727 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=727&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB727_.HTM |