HI SB476 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage annually starting January 1, 2020. Beginning September 30, 2024, and thereafter, requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers, subject to certain conditions. Repeals the tip credit.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB727 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB476 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
SB476 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=476&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB476_.HTM |