HI HCR44 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR44
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging United States President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. And The Asiapacific Economic Cooperation To Hold The 2023 Asiapacific Economic Cooperation Summit In The City And County Of Honolulu, State Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging United States President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. And The Asiapacific Economic Cooperation To Hold The 2023 Asiapacific Economic Cooperation Summit In The City And County Of Honolulu, State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2021-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (4). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement (Hse. Com. No. 622) |
2021-04-22 | House | Deferred one day 04-23-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 825) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 343). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:15AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-22 | House | Offered |
2021-02-19 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR44 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR35 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR35 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.