HI SB2186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the conveyance to the Department of Education of certain lands used for public schools and held by the counties of Kauai and Maui, the State, and the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Requires legislative approval prior to the sale, gift, or alienation of the fee simple title to lands held by the Department of Education. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Public School Land Transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 180-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 180-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Tarnas, Eli, Clark, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Tarnas, Eli Co-Chairs; Clark, Okimoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Inouye, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1940-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Ohno, McDermott. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Yamane, Okimoto. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 157) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2927) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |