HI SB2243 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires bills to amend or create new offenses, or to change parole or probation procedures, to be accompanied by a correctional impact statement. Requires assistance of the corrections population management commission to prepare corrections population impact.
Title
Corrections; Correctional Impact Statement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-11-10 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2243&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2243_.HTM |