HI SB2243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the house and senate to permit remote testimony, via telephone, at public hearings.
Title
Relating To Legislative Testimony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2418 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2243&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2243_.HTM |