HI SB2401 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period of separation that a police officer can order under suspicion of physical abuse or harm to 4:30 p.m. on the second business day following the weekend or legal holiday if the forty-eight hour period of separation expires on any Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday or if the incident occurs after 12:00 p.m. on any Friday, or on any Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday.
Title
Period of Separation; Abuse; Family or Household Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1570 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2401&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2401_.HTM |