HI SB2429 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Serves as a vehicle to implement the 2011 recommendations of the mortgage foreclosure task force. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB2429 HD1)
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 760). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-12 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senator(s) Galuteria added as conferee(s). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Taniguchi. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 448). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 5:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-30-12 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Cullen, Fontaine, Giugni, Hanohano, Har, Johanson, Kawakami, M. Lee, Luke, Marumoto, McKelvey, Morikawa, Pine, Riviere, Takai, Ward, Wooley, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching voting no (1) and Representative(s) Herkes, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, McKelvey, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Brower, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, McKelvey, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Marumoto, Thielen; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ching; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-12-12 2:10PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2709) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-12 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2374) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-10-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |